U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00934-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castro-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Extend (other)]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.