U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00945-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.