U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00948-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • October 04, 2022: [Release from Custody]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.