U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00677-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reveles-Solorio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • June 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.