U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00931-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Hinojos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 03, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 12, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.