U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00839-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Esqueda-Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.