U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cadena
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 13, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.