U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luviano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
November, 2024
  • November 06, 2024: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 16, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.