U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barber, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.