U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tsosie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extend (other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 17, 2023: [Release from Custody]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Release from Custody]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.