U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasco-Valenzuela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Court Reporter Estimation Date for Transcript Order]
  • September 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • September 11, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • August 18, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • August 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 16, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.