U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nealey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Court Reporter Estimation Date for Transcript Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Transcript Order Form]
  • January 06, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Transcript Order Form]
  • January 03, 2023: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.