U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaramillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 29, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.