U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-01056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 12, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2022: [Discovery Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.