U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Court Reporter Estimation Date for Transcript Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • November 16, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • November 15, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • November 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 08, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.