U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dotey-Young
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 04, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 28, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • July 28, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.