U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ordonez-Mendoza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [CJA 7 - Order Terminating Attorney]
  • August 04, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 01, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.