U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-01689-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jarquin-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 13, 2023: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • July 05, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.