U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ponce Valverde
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.