U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olvera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Transferring Jurisdiction - Part I]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.