U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.