U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Salinas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Minute Order]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.