U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00580-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moorhead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.