U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lara-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • December 07, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • November 02, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 02, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 07, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.