U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solorio-Montelongo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.