U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00999-1
  • Case Name: USA v. John
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.