U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.