U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandoval
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 16, 2022: [Acquittal]
  • December 15, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 14, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 12, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 12, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 09, 2022: [Court's Jury Instructions]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • December 07, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • December 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • December 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 06, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 01, 2022: [Minute Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 28, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 26, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.