U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01899-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 06, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.