U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nieto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 12, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.