U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whelan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 24, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.