U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00572-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 14, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.