U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01168-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saenz-Carmona
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.