U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 17, 2023: [Seal Document]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.