U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 24, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.