U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01172-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trujillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.