U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01058-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Tellez, et al.,
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 15, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2022: [Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 01, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.