U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cr-01143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Oral Order]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.