U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Pena v. Board of County Commissioners of Cibola County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extend (other)]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Acknowledgment of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 23, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • July 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.