U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 21, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric/Psychological Exam]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Psychiatric/Psychological Exam]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Discovery Order]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.