U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Elledge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 24, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • August 24, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 21, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.