U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01218-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alvarez-Barban
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 12, 2023: [Release from Custody]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 07, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 25, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • July 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.