U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Caivinagua-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • November 04, 2022: [Court Reporter Estimation Date for Transcript Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • October 28, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • October 26, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 26, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.