U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00545
  • Case Name: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America v. RNS Auto Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • September 08, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.