U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00549
  • Case Name: Chrisman v. United States Postal Service
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Adopting Joint Status Report]
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • July 26, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appendix/Supplement]
  • July 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.