U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Galindo-Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.