U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.