U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-01240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tomasaour, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 05, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 30, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.