U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-01242-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soroa-Flores
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 19, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Discovery Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.