U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00565
  • Case Name: Lowrey v. Sandoval County Children Youth and Families Department et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 09, 2022: [Objections]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Strike]
  • September 06, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 15, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 15, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • August 15, 2022: [Objections]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 29, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • July 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.